Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Konopacki

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1611Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Aug 1611AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Nov 1613DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Maciej Konopacki:
Bishop Maciej Konopacki (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015