Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto von Königsmarck

Deceased

Bishop of Havelberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1428¹Born
149365.0SelectedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
13 Jan 149466.0ConfirmedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
29 Sep 149466.7Ordained BishopBishop of Havelberg, Germany
20 Aug 150173.6DiedBishop of Havelberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto von Königsmarck (VIAF: 80566440)
Bishop Otto von Königsmarck (born 1428, died ) Bishop of Havelberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Havelberg, Diocese of Havelberg

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,426
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,624
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,494, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast