Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Innocentius (Leopoldus Ludovicus) Kollonitz, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1681BornSopron, Hungary
31 May 170018.7ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
11 Dec 173453.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
31 Oct 173554.1DiedBishop-Elect of Aureliopolis in Asia

MicroData Summary for Innocentius (Leopoldus Ludovicus) Kollonitz:
Father Innocentius (Leopoldus Ludovicus) Kollonitz O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Aureliopolis in Asia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108, and Page 455
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015