Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Kölderer von Burgstall

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
156125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
6 Feb 156731.0SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Jan 156933.0ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
22 Jun 157943.4DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Kölderer von Burgstall (VIAF: 30379218)
Bishop David Kölderer von Burgstall (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018