Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gebhard (Ferdinand) Koberger, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Abbot Primate Emeritus of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1909BornWien, Austria
27 Jun 193525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
196858.0AppointedAbbot Primate of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
197464.0ResignedAbbot Primate of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
16 Aug 199787.6DiedAbbot Primate Emeritus of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine

MicroData Summary for Gebhard (Ferdinand) Koberger:
Priest Gebhard (Ferdinand) Koberger C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Abbot Primate Emeritus of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine

  • a priest for 62.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013