Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wenzel Kobaltz

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1732Born
3 Apr 175624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
15 May 179563.2AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
2 May 179664.2DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wenzel Kobaltz
Father Wenzel Kobaltz (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWittichenau

  • a priest for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast