Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sighard Karl Kleiner, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1904Born
16 Sep 192823.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 192925.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Cistercians
16 Oct 193228.0Perpetual VowsPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 May 195348.5AppointedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians
27 Aug 198580.8ResignedAbbot General of Order of Cistercians
5 Dec 199591.1DiedAbbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

MicroData Summary for Sighard Karl Kleiner (VIAF: 199255224)
Father Sighard Karl Kleiner O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBregenz, Austria

  • a priest for 67.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017