Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Robert Kirwan

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jul 1758SelectedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
21 Aug 1758ConfirmedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
10 Jun 1776DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Patrick Robert Kirwan
Bishop Patrick Robert Kirwan (died ) Bishop of Achonry

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018