Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kingscote

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1462AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
24 Oct 1462Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
5 Nov 1463DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Kingscote
Bishop John Kingscote (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLondon

  • a bishop for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,468
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 170
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast