Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Ambrose Kielt, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Missionary Society of St. Columban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1910Born
21 Dec 193424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
1962²51.0AppointedSuperior General of Missionary Society of St. Columban
1970²59.0CeasedSuperior General of Missionary Society of St. Columban
15 Aug 199685.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Missionary Society of St. Columban

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Ambrose Kielt (VIAF: 287595683)
Father James Ambrose Kielt S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionary Society of St. Columban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallyscullion, County Derry, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Columban’s College, Dalgan Park, Galway, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
Death PlaceDalgan
Buried Place (Original)Dalgan

  • a priest for 61.6 years

Source(s):
  • b/d/loc: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast