Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miklós Keszei

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1347AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
11 Jan 1350AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
4 Aug 1356AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
8 Oct 1358AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
Jun 1366³DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miklós Keszei
Archbishop Miklós Keszei (died Jun 1366) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 537, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast