Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Kernivinen, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1876BornTréglamus, France
24 Jul 189822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
2 Jan 191235.8AppointedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
1919²42.8ResignedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Feb 192952.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Kernivinen
Father Pierre Kernivinen S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo

  • a priest for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016