Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jozef Kerec, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1892Born
19 Mar 191522.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 May 192330.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1939²46.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China
1951²58.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China
27 Jun 197481.6DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jozef Kerec
Father Jozef Kerec S.D.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Zhaotong [Chaotung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProsečka Vas
Death PlaceVerzej

  • a priest for 51.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 12 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast