Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gregor Kathmann von Maurugk

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1589BornBautzen
1 Apr 161021.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
9 Jul 162031.3AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
3 May 164455.1DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gregor Kathmann von Maurugk:
Father Gregor Kathmann von Maurugk (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 34.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015