Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Folmar (Volmar) de Karden

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1135¹Born
25 May 118348.3SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
1 Jun 118651.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
26 Jun 118954.4RemovedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
Nov 1189³54.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Folmar (Volmar) de Karden (VIAF: 100448420)
Archbishop Folmar (Volmar) de Karden (born 1135, died Nov 1189) Archbishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast