Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jan Mikołaj Kaliński

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Chełm and Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland

Titular See: Belz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1799Born
15 Dec 182223.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186363.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
16 Mar 186363.8SucceededBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Oct 186667.4DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Mikołaj Kaliński
Father Jan Mikołaj Kaliński (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Chełm and Bełz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadzin

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199, and Page 146
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 305
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017