Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Wincenty Kadłubek, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1150¹BornKargów k. Stopnicy
28 Mar 120858.2AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
May 1208³58.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
1218¹68.0ResignedBishop of Kraków, Poland
8 Mar 122373.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland
18 Feb 1764Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Wincenty Kadłubek:
Bishop Bl. Wincenty Kadłubek O. Cist. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kraków

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,616
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013