Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Junco Posada

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1528BornLlanes
3 Apr 159869.9AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
6 Sep 159870.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
3 May 160274.0DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Junco Posada:
Bishop Pedro Junco Posada (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,821
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 111, Number 704
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015