Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronim Maciej Jełowicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1672³BornZkzowicz
169522.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 172552.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
21 Feb 172552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
20 May 172552.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
8 Jan 173259.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronim Maciej Jełowicki:
Bishop Hieronim Maciej Jełowicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 309
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,032
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015