Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balthasar de Jarente

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1530AppointedBishop of Vence, France
11 May 1543AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
9 Jan 1548AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
27 Jun 1555DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Balthasar de Jarente
Archbishop Balthasar de Jarente (died ) Archbishop of Embrun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018