Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Baptiste Janssens, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior General of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1889Born
Sep 1909³19.6First VowsMember of Society of Jesus
1919²29.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Sep 194656.7AppointedSuperior General of Society of Jesus
5 Oct 196474.7DiedSuperior General of Society of Jesus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Janssens (VIAF: 76074408)
Father Jean-Baptiste Janssens S.J. (born , died ) Superior General of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.7 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast