Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fryderyk Cardinal Jagiellończyk

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1468Born
13 Apr 148820.0SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
2 May 148820.0ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
24 Mar 149324.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 149324.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 149325.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149325.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
2 Oct 149325.5AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Dec 149325.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Mar 150334.9DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Fryderyk Jagiellończyk (VIAF: 13505237)
Fryderyk Cardinal Jagiellończyk (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained DeaconKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained PriestKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Death PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,919
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1493, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 7 Jan 2019

Quantcast