Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Angelo Jacoboni

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1730BornTerni
27 Jan 176029.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 177545.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
30 Aug 178555.4DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Angelo Jacoboni:
Bishop Francesco Angelo Jacoboni (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015