Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Izdebski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Raulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1616³Born
11 Apr 164831.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Apr 164832.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 169680.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
18 Jun 169680.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Raulia
15 Oct 169781.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raulia
3 Nov 170286.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Izdebski
Bishop Wojciech Izdebski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWierzbolˇw k. Wklkowyszek

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,697, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast