Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedykt Izdbieński

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1488¹Born
19 Feb 154658.1AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
17 May 154658.4AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
18 Jan 155365.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedykt Izdbieński:
Bishop Benedykt Izdbieński (died ) Bishop of Poznań

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 148, and Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013