Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Isnard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1593AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
19 Dec 1593Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
1605¹ResignedBishop of Glandèves, France
11 May 1612DiedBishop Emeritus of Glandèves, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Isnard
Bishop Clément Isnard (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nice, Diocese of Nice
Death PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,593, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast