Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Isfar y Corillas

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Aug 1574AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
23 Jan 1579AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
15 Apr 1600DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Isfar y Corillas
Bishop Gilberto Isfar y Corillas (died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018