Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann von Isenburg

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507Born
20 Apr 154740.3SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
1 Jul 154740.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
18 Feb 155649.1DiedArchbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Isenburg (VIAF: 6140179)
Father Johann von Isenburg (born 1507, died ) Archbishop-Elect of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuwied

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 12*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018