Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Huthen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1509AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Jan 1509AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
25 Feb 1509Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
28 Apr 1532DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Huthen (VIAF: 15844578)
Bishop Paul Huthen (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrüningen
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 May 2018

Quantcast