Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Giorgio Huber

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sweden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1820Born
1 Sep 187454.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sweden
25 Mar 188665.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Sweden

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giorgio Huber:
Priest Giovanni Giorgio Huber (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sweden

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013