Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Hoyos de Salamanca

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1504²Born
11 Mar 152319.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gurk, Austria
25 Jun 152622.4SucceededBishop of Gurk, Austria
3 Feb 154036.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 154036.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
1551¹47.0DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Hoyos de Salamanca (VIAF: 80560287)
Bishop Antonio Hoyos de Salamanca (born 1504, died 1551) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento, Italy

  • a priest for 10.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 36, Number 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 207
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,916
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017