Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerhard von Hoya

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1412Born
24 Jan 144230.0SelectedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
1 Apr 144230.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
29 Sep 144230.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
11 Apr 146351.2DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard von Hoya
Archbishop Gerhard von Hoya (born 1412, died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

  • a bishop for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018