Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Hagop Petros II Hovsepian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1689¹BornAlep
5 Jun 172031.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 174051.4Ordained BishopBishop
14 Oct 174960.8SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
23 Sep 175061.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
9 Jun 175364.4DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hagop Petros II Hovsepian:
Patriarch Hagop Petros II Hovsepian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 165
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,925

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013