Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Cirill Tamás Hortobágyi, O.S.B.

Abbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1959 Born
21 Aug 197718.4EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Aug 198122.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Aug 198526.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Aug 198526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Feb 201858.9AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Cirill Tamás Hortobágyi
Abbot Cirill Tamás Hortobágyi O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagytálya

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Pannonhalma.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast