Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Mikołaj Horain

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1651Born
9 Apr 167827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Sep 170453.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Sep 170453.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
17 May 170554.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
23 Dec 171160.7AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
7 Dec 171665.6AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
7 Dec 173584.6DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Mikołaj Horain (VIAF: 42952829)
Bishop Aleksander Mikołaj Horain (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLysków, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained Bishopsw. Stanislawa Biskupa, Cathedral, Vilnius, Diocese of Vilnius
Death PlaceSzylgal

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343, and Page 359
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 6
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast