Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Hopfgarten, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1455AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Nov 1455AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
13 Jul 1456Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
24 Mar 1460DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Hopfgarten (VIAF: 316495297)
Bishop Heinrich Hopfgarten O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErfurt
Death PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 3.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,610
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,456, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast