Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Hornet (Hoerne)

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1483AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
11 Sep 1485Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
19 Dec 1505DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Hornet (Hoerne):
Bishop Jean Hornet (Hoerne) (died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015