Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eberhard von Holle

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany

Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531Born
16 May 156130.3SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
31 Aug 156231.6ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
21 Feb 156736.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Verden, Germany
157140.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany
157140.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Verden, Germany
5 Jul 158655.5DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eberhard von Holle
Father Eberhard von Holle (born 1531, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaden

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018