Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Landolf von Hoheneck

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Nov 1234AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
1 May 1236Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
8 Jun 1247DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Landolf von Hoheneck
Bishop Landolf von Hoheneck (died ) Bishop of Worms

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 534
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,041

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 May 2019

Quantcast