Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Hoffmann

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1369Born
6 Jun 142758.4SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
10 Sep 142758.6ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
12 Apr 145182.2DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Hoffmann
Bishop Johannes Hoffmann (born 1369, died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchweidnitz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018