Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hartbert von Hildesheim

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1199²AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1 Aug 1201³Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
21 Mar 1216DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hartbert von Hildesheim (VIAF: 232348493)
Bishop Hartbert von Hildesheim (died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCorvey

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276
  • b/c2: CB, 3 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast