Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam de Heurtelou

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
5 Mar 158650.1AppointedBishop of Mende, France
11 Jun 158650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
26 Jun 160973.4DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam de Heurtelou
Bishop Adam de Heurtelou (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Mans, Diocese of Le Mans
Ordained BishopS. Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceMende, Diocese of Mende

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,586, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast