Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Hernández, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1769Born
30 Jan 182656.6SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
13 Mar 182656.7ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
29 Jun 182657.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
21 Jul 182960.0DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Hernández
Bishop Pablo Hernández O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 343
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,826, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast