Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pablo Hernando Moreno, O.S.A.

Apostolic Administrator of Cafayate, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1946 Born
27 Sep 196418.4Temporary VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
3 Oct 196721.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
12 Jul 197024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
28 Oct 201973.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cafayate, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pablo Hernando Moreno (VIAF: 4156809453445121179)
Father Pablo Hernando Moreno O.S.A. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Cafayate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoria, Spain
Ordained PriestSan Agustín, Madrid

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Prelature of Cafayate.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 29 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast