Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Péter Herešinec (Heressinczy)

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1584AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
8 Mar 1585AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
26 Oct 1587AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
10 Jun 1590DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Péter Herešinec (Heressinczy) (VIAF: 290630990)
Bishop Péter Herešinec (Heressinczy) (died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216, and Page 338
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,584, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast