Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Henriques Monis

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1790Born
9 Mar 181625.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 184555.1SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
24 Nov 184555.3ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
12 Jul 184655.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 Jul 184756.9DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for João Henriques Monis
Bishop João Henriques Monis (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFunchal

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for .9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 218
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,725
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast