Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal de Hémard de Denonville

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

Administrator of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1493BornDenonville, Beauce
151825.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 153138.1AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
22 Dec 153644.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153744.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
9 Dec 153845.9AppointedAdministrator of Amiens, France
23 Aug 154047.6DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Hémard de Denonville:
Cardinal Charles de Hémard de Denonville (died ) Bishop of Mâcon

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013