Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard von Helmstatt

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
8 Jan 143838.0AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
Jul 143838.5Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 Mar 145656.2DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reinhard von Helmstatt (VIAF: 86133537)
Bishop Reinhard von Helmstatt (born 1400, died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 17.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast