Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Kilian J. Healy, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1912BornWorcester, MA, USA
15 Aug 193118.8ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
11 Aug 193724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
Sep 195946.8AppointedPrior General of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
197158.1ResignedPrior General of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
18 May 200390.5DiedPrior General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel

MicroData Summary for Kilian J. Healy:
Priest Kilian J. Healy O. Carm. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel

  • a priest for 65.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013