Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Maximilian von Haunold

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1735³Born
24 Aug 176125.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
28 Aug 176126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
18 Jun 179256.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
18 Jun 179256.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
21 Jan 180771.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Maximilian von Haunold
Bishop Johann Maximilian von Haunold (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 45.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,792, Number 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast